Global Patent Index - EP 1023557 A1

EP 1023557 A1 2000-08-02 - SEGMENTED REFLECTOR FOR COUPLING AN EXTENDED ILLUMINATION SOURCE TO A PLURALITY OF FIBRE ELEMENTS

Title (en)

SEGMENTED REFLECTOR FOR COUPLING AN EXTENDED ILLUMINATION SOURCE TO A PLURALITY OF FIBRE ELEMENTS

Title (de)

SEGMENTIERTER REFLEKTOR ZUR KOPPELUNG EINER LÄNGLICHEN LICHTQUELLE AN MEHRERE LICHTLEITER

Title (fr)

REFLECTEUR EN SECTEURS PERMETTANT DE COUPLER UNE SOURCE ETENDUE D'ECLAIRAGE À PLUSIEURS ÉLÉMENTS DE FIBRES

Publication

EP 1023557 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905557 A

Priority

  • US 9902002 W
  • US 7330798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939134A1] An optical fiber illumination system comprises a segmented reflector that efficiently couples energy from a lamp into a plurality of optical fibers. The segmented reflector offers the ability to improve the coupling efficiency by utilizing the cross-sectional area and numerical aperture of more than one optical fiber at the output of a reflector. Also this reduces the energy collected by a single fiber, and can be useful in preventing damage created by the source intensity. In practice, a source lamp (12) is placed along a reflector axis (16). The reflector (14) is specifically designed for a particular style and type of lamp, and is designed to collect as many rays from that lamp as possible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 8/00 (2006.01); G02B 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/0006 (2013.01); G02B 6/4298 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939134 A1 19990805; EP 1023557 A1 20000802; EP 1023557 A4 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070303

2006-10-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SEGMENTED REFLECTOR FOR COUPLING AN EXTENDED ILLUMINATION SOURCE TO A PLURALITY OF FIBRE ELEMENTS

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050418

2000-11-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 8/00 A

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE