Global Patent Index - EP 1023571 A1

EP 1023571 A1 2000-08-02 - MEASURING HEAD

Title (en)

MEASURING HEAD

Title (de)

MESSKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE DE MESURE

Publication

EP 1023571 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954392 A

Priority

  • DE 19745971 A
  • EP 9806436 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745971C1] The invention relates to an measuring head for a simulator for simulating the firing of especially long-range weapons. The inventive measuring head has an illumination emitter (10) for illuminating a target with a pulsed laser beam in order to simulate fire, a receiver (11) for the laser light reflected in the target and a signal processing element (12) for determining the spatial and temporal position of the target. The laser beam emitted by the illumination emitter (10) is a vertical laser line which illuminates a defined solid angle (emittance angle) homogeneously and which can be deflected horizontally. This enables several targets to be detected with high resolution in a relatively large measuring field. The receiver (11) has a vertically oriented high resolution detector line (14) with a solid viewing angle which is identical to the emittance angle. The detector line (14) is made up of a plurality of individual detector elements (141) arranged one above the other. An independent channel (121) is allocated to each detector element (141) for processing signals. The illumination emitter (10) and the receiver (11) are synchronised with each other in such a way that the emittance angle and the viewing angle of the detector line are congruent at all times.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/2683 (2013.01); F41G 3/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920972A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745971 C1 19981022; AU 1152499 A 19990510; CA 2293561 A1 19990429; EP 1023571 A1 20000802; NO 20001264 A 20000310; NO 20001264 D0 20000310; WO 9920972 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040914

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL DEFENCE ELECTRONICS GMBH

2000-10-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE