Global Patent Index - EP 1023621 A1

EP 1023621 A1 2000-08-02 - SWITCHABLE OPTICAL COMPONENTS

Title (en)

SWITCHABLE OPTICAL COMPONENTS

Title (de)

SCHALTBARE OPTISCHE KOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSANTS OPTIQUES COMMUTABLES

Publication

EP 1023621 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943190 A

Priority

  • US 9816736 W
  • US 5557197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909440A1] This invention relates to a number of components, devices and networks involving integrated optics and/or half coupler technology, all of which involve the use of electronically switchable Bragg grating devices and device geometries realized using holographic polymer/dispersed liquid crystal materials. Most of the components and devices are particularly adapted for use in wavelength division multiplexing (WDM) systems and in particular for use in switchable add/drop filtering (SADF) and wavelength selective crossconnect. Attenuators, outcouplers and a variety of other devices are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/12; G02B 6/26; G02B 6/34; H04B 10/12; H04J 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/12 (2006.01); G02F 1/01 (2006.01); G02F 1/313 (2006.01); G02B 6/28 (2006.01); G02F 1/1334 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/12007 (2013.01); G02F 1/011 (2013.01); G02F 1/313 (2013.01); G02B 6/2826 (2013.01); G02B 2006/12107 (2013.01); G02B 2006/12145 (2013.01); G02B 2006/12147 (2013.01); G02F 1/1334 (2013.01); G02F 2201/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909440 A1 19990225; AU 9103798 A 19990308; CA 2300170 A1 19990225; EP 1023621 A1 20000802; EP 1023621 A4 20010808; JP 2001516062 A 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041030

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIGILENS INC.

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-08-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 02B 6/12 A, 7G 02B 6/26 B, 7G 02B 6/34 B, 7H 04J 14/02 B, 7H 04B 10/12 B, 7G 02F 1/313 B, 7G 02F 1/01 B

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOSTER-MILLER INC.

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT