Global Patent Index - EP 1023621 A4

EP 1023621 A4 20010808 - SWITCHABLE OPTICAL COMPONENTS

Title (en)

SWITCHABLE OPTICAL COMPONENTS

Title (de)

SCHALTBARE OPTISCHE KOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSANTS OPTIQUES COMMUTABLES

Publication

EP 1023621 A4 20010808 (EN)

Application

EP 98943190 A 19980813

Priority

  • US 9816736 W 19980813
  • US 5557197 P 19970813

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909440A1] This invention relates to a number of components, devices and networks involving integrated optics and/or half coupler technology, all of which involve the use of electronically switchable Bragg grating devices and device geometries realized using holographic polymer/dispersed liquid crystal materials. Most of the components and devices are particularly adapted for use in wavelength division multiplexing (WDM) systems and in particular for use in switchable add/drop filtering (SADF) and wavelength selective crossconnect. Attenuators, outcouplers and a variety of other devices are also provided.

IPC 1-7

G02B 6/12; G02B 6/26; G02B 6/34; G02F 1/01; G02F 1/313; H04B 10/12; H04J 14/02

IPC 8 full level

G02B 6/12 (2006.01); G02F 1/01 (2006.01); G02F 1/313 (2006.01); G02B 6/28 (2006.01); G02F 1/1334 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP KR)

G02B 6/12007 (2013.01 - EP KR); G02B 6/2826 (2013.01 - KR); G02F 1/011 (2013.01 - EP KR); G02F 1/1334 (2013.01 - KR); G02F 1/313 (2013.01 - EP KR); G02B 6/2826 (2013.01 - EP); G02B 2006/12107 (2013.01 - EP KR); G02B 2006/12145 (2013.01 - EP KR); G02B 2006/12147 (2013.01 - EP KR); G02F 1/1334 (2013.01 - EP); G02F 2201/30 (2013.01 - EP KR)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4721352 A 19880126 - SORIN WAYNE V [US], et al
  • [XY] DOMASH L. , CHEN Y -M , GOZEWSKI C. , HAUGSJAA P. , OREN M.: "Electronically switchable Bragg gratings for large-scale NxN fiber optic crossconnects", CONFERENCE SPIE: DIFFRACTIVE AND HOLOGRAPHIC DEVICE TECHNOLOGIES AND APPLICATIONS IV, 12-13 FEB. 1997, SAN JOSE, vol. 3010, pages 214 - 228, XP000099958
  • [Y] SUTHERLAND R L ET AL: "ELECTRICALLY SWITCHABLE VOLUME GRATINGS IN POLYMER-DISPERSED LIQUIDCRYSTALS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 64, no. 9, 28 February 1994 (1994-02-28), pages 1074 - 1076, XP000425907, ISSN: 0003-6951
  • [A] DOMASH L. & AL.: "Switchable - Focus lenses in holographic polymer dispersed liquid crystal", CONFERENCE SPIE : DIFFRACTIVE AND HOLOGRAPHIC OPTICS TECHNOLOGY III, 1-2 FEB. 1996, SAN JOSE, vol. 2689, 1 February 1996 (1996-02-01) - 2 February 1996 (1996-02-02), pages 188 - 194, XP001000005
  • [A] ARCHAMBAULT J -L ET AL: "GRATING-FRUSTRATED COUPLER: A NOVEL CHANNEL-DROPPING FILTER IN SINGLE-MODE OPTICAL FIBER", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, vol. 19, no. 3, 1 February 1994 (1994-02-01), pages 180 - 182, XP000424359, ISSN: 0146-9592
  • [A] DONG L ET AL: "NOVEL ADD/DROP FILTERS FOR WAVELENGHT-DIVISION-MULTIPLEXING OPTICALFIBER SYSTEMS USING A BRAGG GRATING ASSISTED MISMATCHED COUPLER", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 8, no. 12, 1 December 1996 (1996-12-01), pages 1656 - 1658, XP000679542, ISSN: 1041-1135
  • See also references of WO 9909440A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 9909440 A1 19990225; AU 9103798 A 19990308; CA 2300170 A1 19990225; EP 1023621 A1 20000802; EP 1023621 A4 20010808; JP 2001516062 A 20010925; KR 20010022911 A 20010326

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 9816736 W 19980813; AU 9103798 A 19980813; CA 2300170 A 19980813; EP 98943190 A 19980813; JP 2000510049 A 19980813; KR 20007001516 A 20000214