Global patent index - EP 1023641 A1

EP 1023641 A1 2000-08-02 - DESIGN RULE CHECKING SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (en)

DESIGN RULE CHECKING SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (de)

METHODE UND SYSTEM ZUR KONTROLLE VON ENTWURFSREGELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE REGLES DE CONCEPTION

Publication

EP 1023641 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951922 A

Priority

  • US 9819510 W
  • US 5930697 P
  • US 93192197 A
  • US 6954997 P
  • US 13099698 A
  • US 15439798 A
  • US 15378398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914638A1] A method for performing design rule checking on an optical proximity correction (OPC) corrected or otherwise corrected designs is described. The corrected design is accessed to generate a simulated image (2010). The simulated image corresponds to a simulation of an image which would be printed on a wafer if the wafer was exposed to an illumination source directed through the corrected design (2020). The characteristics of the illuminaiton source are determined by a set of lithography parameters. In creating the image, additional characteristics can be used to simulate portions of the fabrication process. The simulated image can then be used by the design rule checker. Importantly, the simulated image can be processed to reduce the number of vertices in the simulated image, relative to the number of vertices in the OPC corrected design layout (2020). Also, the simulated image can be compared with an ideal layout image, the results of which can then be used to reduce the amount of information that is needed to perform the design rule checking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 9/00; G06F 17/00; G06F 17/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/00 (2012.01); G03F 9/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01); H01L 21/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914638 A1 19990325; AU 9396098 A 19990405; AU 9396198 A 19990405; AU 9775198 A 19990405; EP 1023639 A1 20000802; EP 1023639 A4 20090429; EP 1023641 A1 20000802; EP 1023641 A4 20090422; JP 2003523545 A 20030805; JP 2003526110 A 20030902; JP 4624550 B2 20110202

INPADOC legal status

2012-04-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20111020

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-04-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G03F 1/14 20060101AFI20090313BHEP

2005-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNOPSYS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNOPSYS MERGER HOLDINGS LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUMERICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT