Global Patent Index - EP 1023698 B1

EP 1023698 B1 2001-12-19 - PASSAGE CONTROL DEVICE FOR NON-CONTACTING DATA CARRIERS

Title (en)

PASSAGE CONTROL DEVICE FOR NON-CONTACTING DATA CARRIERS

Title (de)

DURCHGANGSKONTROLLEINRICHTUNG FÜR BERÜHRUNGSLOSE DATENTRÄGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE PASSAGE POUR SUPPORTS DE DONNEES SANS CONTACT

Publication

EP 1023698 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929201 A

Priority

  • DE 19831767 A
  • EP 9904083 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831767A1] The access control station is in the form of a turnstile (4) that has a number of projecting arms (10) that have to be indexed to allow an individual to pass through. The release mechanism is controlled by a built in module that responds to signals from a non contact data carrier. The carrier can be in the form of a card or wrist worn element. This is detected by an antenna (13,14) in the turnstile unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/02 (2006.01); H04B 1/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831767 A1 20000120; DE 19831767 C2 20020328; AT 211282 T 20020115; CA 2312930 A1 20000127; EP 1023698 A1 20000802; EP 1023698 B1 20011219; JP 2002520752 A 20020709; JP 4119609 B2 20080716; US 6310581 B1 20011030; WO 0004511 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900579 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211282 T 20020115

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE