Global Patent Index - EP 1023735 A1

EP 1023735 A1 2000-08-02 - HEATING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

HEATING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

HEIZELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ELEMENT CHAUFFANT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1023735 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947223 A

Priority

  • AT 9800233 W
  • AT 167797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918586A1] The invention relates to a heating element which has a high heating-up rate and which has a predetermined resistance value, for triggering airbag systems. According to the inventive method for producing said heating element, a base consisting of an aluminium oxide ceramic is provided with a glass or glass ceramic coating. The surface of said coating can be lapped and polished if necessary. An extensive layer of AuPd-resinate is applied to the surface of the coating using the silk screen process and then structured into a resistance strip using etching technology. Said resistance strip is constricted in some areas and the ends of the resistance strip are brought into contact with an AgPd-thick-film conductor paste during the silk screen process, the Pd content of said paste being definitive for the desired resistance value. After the thick-film conductor paste has been dried and baked, the coated base is heated at temperatures of between 850 DEG C and 950 DEG C until the palladium in the resistance layer is evenly distributed and a stable resistance value has been established. Solder stop dams in the form of glass stops are arranged on the edges of the AgPd contacts facing the resistance strip in order to reduce the risk of unwanted alloys being formed on the resistance strip during a subsequent soldering process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 17/065; H01C 1/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/12 (2006.01); F42B 3/198 (2006.01); H01C 1/142 (2006.01); H01C 17/06 (2006.01); H01C 17/065 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 17/065 (2013.01); F42B 3/124 (2013.01); F42B 3/198 (2013.01); H01C 1/142 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49099 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918586A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918586 A1 19990415; AT 405591 B 19990927; AT A167797 A 19990115; AU 9423698 A 19990427; BR 9814811 A 20001003; DE 59805128 D1 20020912; EP 1023735 A1 20000802; EP 1023735 B1 20020807; ES 2179534 T3 20030116; JP 2001519595 A 20011023; US 6316752 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061003

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179534 T3

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805128 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011026

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT