Global patent index - EP 1023736 A1

EP 1023736 A1 2000-08-02 - RADIO INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION CHOKE

Title (en)

RADIO INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION CHOKE

Title (de)

DROSSEL ZUR FUNKENTSTÖRUNG

Title (fr)

SELF ANTIPARASITE

Publication

EP 1023736 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958180 A

Priority

  • DE 9802914 W
  • DE 19745390 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919889A1] The invention relates to a radio interference suppression choke, comprising a connection wire (1) consisting of an electroconductive and heat conductive non-ferromagnetic first alloy and a strip-wound magnetic core (2) consisting of a ferromagnetic second alloy and comprising a thin strip wound around the connection wire (1) to form a coil and connected to said connection wire (1) at the ends with a positive fit. In addition to enabling automatiseable further processing, the inventive radio interference suppression choke provides optimal thermal contact of the strip-wound magnetic core with the printed circuit board via the connection wire which is configured as a current-carrying conductor. This enables any excess temperature arising in the strip-wound magnetic core to be reduced to a more suitable level for the alloys used and consequently drastically reduces the problem of ageing which is e-functionally related to temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 37/00; H01F 27/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/30 (2006.01); H01F 27/29 (2006.01); H01F 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/29 (2013.01); H01F 37/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919889A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919889 A1 19990422; EP 1023736 A1 20000802; EP 1023736 B1 20020529; JP 2001524746 A 20011204; JP 2008263213 A 20081030; JP 4308426 B2 20090805; JP 4452808 B2 20100421; US 6310534 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-07-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-10-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2005-09-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-04

2002-06-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2002-05-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE