Global patent index - EP 1023825 A1

EP 1023825 A1 2000-08-02 - Suspension and working device or vehicle

Title (en)

Suspension and working device or vehicle

Title (de)

Aufhängung und Arbeitsgerät bzw. Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Suspension et dispositif de travail ou véhicule

Publication

EP 1023825 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101541 A

Priority

US 24025599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6079193A] A suspension for supporting an implement on a vehicle includes a transversely extending pivot shaft secured to a frame of the vehicle and a support link swingably mounted on the pivot shaft at one end portion. A second end portion of the support link extends therefrom in a fore-and-aft direction. Two spaced-apart, fore-and-aft extending support arms are also swingably secured to the pivot shaft at one end portion and are connected at another end portion to opposite sides of the implement. A lift member is coupled to the frame of the vehicle at a first end portion and to the support link at a second end portion for swinging the link about the pivot shaft. A lost motion coupling is provided between a midportion of each of the two support arms and the second end portion of the support link. The lost motion coupling includes a pin and an oversized sleeve for receiving the pin. One of the pin and the sleeve is fixed to the midportion of each of the support arms and the other of the pin and the sleeve is fixed to the second end portion of the support link to permit limited independent up and down movement of the support arms without requiring corresponding movement of the support link.

Abstract (de)

Aufhängungen und Arbeitsgerät bzw. Fahrzeuge mit solchen Aufhängungen, die zum Anschluß von Anbaueinrichtungen wie Mähwerken, Kehreinheiten, Räumeinrichtungen etc. dienen, sollen üblicherweise ermöglichen, daß die Anbaueinrichtungen während des Betriebs der Kontur des Untergrunds folgen können, um beispielsweise einen gleichmäßigen Schnitt zu gewährleisten und um Beschädigungen vorzubeugen. Es wird eine Aufhängung (40, 102) vorgeschlagen, die zusätzliche Bewegungsmöglichkeiten eines Tragarms (36, 106), über den eine Anbaueinrichtung an einer Trageinheit, wie einem Fahrzeug (2) oder Arbeitsgerät angeschlossen werden kann, ermöglicht. Darüber hinaus wird ein Arbeitsgerät bzw. ein Fahrzeug (2) mit einer solchen Aufhängung (40, 102) vorgeschlagen. Aufhängungen und Arbeitsgeräte bzw. Fahrzeuge werden in der Rasen-, Garten- und Grundstückspflege eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01D 34/66; A01D 34/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 34/64 (2006.01); A01D 34/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01D 34/64 (2013.01); A01D 34/662 (2013.01); A01D 2101/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5321938 A 19940621 - LEBLANC WENDELL L [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6079193 A 20000627; CA 2288521 A1 20000729; CA 2288521 C 20030114; DE 50004380 D1 20031218; EP 1023825 A1 20000802; EP 1023825 B1 20031112; ES 2204366 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50004380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150127

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150127

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080127

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070129

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070129

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204366

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020730

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI