Global Patent Index - EP 1023847 A2

EP 1023847 A2 2000-08-02 - Adjuster device for sports shoes

Title (en)

Adjuster device for sports shoes

Title (de)

Einstellvorrichtung für Sportschuhe

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ajustement pour chaussures de sport

Publication

EP 1023847 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100175 A

Priority

IT TV990011 A

Abstract (en)

An adjuster device for adjusting the position of the quarter (4) with respect to the shell (2) of a sports shoe, comprising a locking means (5) for temporarily locking the position of the quarter with respect to the shell, the means being actuated by an actuator (21) which can be actuated by the user's weight. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0474 (2013.01); A43B 5/0462 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023847 A2 20000802; EP 1023847 A3 20010711; EP 1023847 B1 20040825; AT 274311 T 20040915; DE 60013189 D1 20040930; DE 60013189 T2 20050915; IT 1311629 B1 20020314; IT TV990011 A1 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080112

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080112

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013189 P 20040930

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDICA S.P.A

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

2002-04-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20020103

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI