Global patent index - EP 1023853 A1

EP 1023853 A1 2000-08-02 - Hair clip with matched teeth

Title (en)

Hair clip with matched teeth

Title (de)

Haarspange mit gepaarten Zähnen

Title (fr)

Pince à cheveux à dents appariees

Publication

EP 1023853 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420015 A

Priority

FR 9901033 A

Abstract (en)

Hair clip (20) has two long jaws (21,22) attached by resilient return articulation (23). It has longitudinal sides with several curved spaced teeth, extending jaws opposite first sides, concavities turned towards teeth of other jaw. Teeth form longitudinal succession of pairs comprising pair of support teeth, ends of which (24A) are arranged and shaped to be supported on hair surface zone.

Abstract (fr)

Une pince à cheveux (20) comporte deux mors allongés (21, 22) reliés par une articulation à rappel élastique (23) et comportant deux premiers bords longitudinaux respectifs, deux autres bords longitudinaux respectifs chacun munis d'une pluralité de dents courbes espacées prolongeant sensiblement les mors à l'opposé des premiers bords et dont les concavités sont tournées vers les dents de l'autre mors ; ces pluralités de dents forment conjointement une succession longitudinale de paires de dents faisant respectivement partie de chaque pluralité de dents, cette succession longitudinale de paires de dents comportant au moins une paire de dents d'appui dont les extrémités (24A) sont disposées et conformées pour venir en appui sur la zone de surface de la chevelure, et au moins une paire de dents de pénétration (25A, 25B) qui sont décalées l'une de l'autre le long desdits autres bords longitudinaux des mors et qui peuvent se croiser pour pénétrer dans la chevelure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 8/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 8/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 8/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023853 A1 20000802; EP 1023853 B1 20040616; CA 2296981 A1 20000729; CA 2296981 C 20040518; FR 2788950 A1 20000804; FR 2788950 B1 20010330; US 6189544 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030228

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI