Global Patent Index - EP 1023854 A2

EP 1023854 A2 2000-08-02 - Device for supplying air for hot air apparatus

Title (en)

Device for supplying air for hot air apparatus

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Beaufschlagung von Warmluftgeräten mit Luft

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'approvisionnement d'air pour appareils à air chaud

Publication

EP 1023854 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101335 A

Priority

DE 19902965 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement supplies at least two hot air devices from a group contg. hand-operated hair dryers, drying brushes (6), drying hoods (8) and washing dryers (9) in a hair salon with air. The air inlet openings of the hot air devices are connected to a central blowing station (1) via an air conducting system (3-5). is also included for a hair salon with an arrangement for providing hot air devices with air.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zur Beaufschlagung von mindestens zwei Warmluftgeräten mit Warmluft, wobei die Lufteinlassöffnung der Warmluftgeräte über ein Luftleitungssystem mit einer zentralen Gebläsevorrichtung verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 20/44; A45D 20/52; A45D 44/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/44 (2006.01); A45D 20/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/52 (2013.01); A45D 20/44 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023854 A2 20000802; EP 1023854 A3 20020220; DE 19902965 A1 20000803; DE 19902965 B4 20070215

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-12-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI