Global Patent Index - EP 1023856 A2

EP 1023856 A2 2000-08-02 - Receptacle for receiving a fluid, gelled or pasty medium

Title (en)

Receptacle for receiving a fluid, gelled or pasty medium

Title (de)

Behälter zur Aufnahme eines fluiden, gelartigen oder pastösen Mediums

Title (fr)

Réceptacle pour recevoir des materiaux fluides, gélifiés ou pâteux

Publication

EP 1023856 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101121 A

Priority

DE 19903504 A

Abstract (en)

The container (1) has a compartment (2) into which a brush (6) is dipped and has an opening (3) in which sits a tapering stopper (4). The brush on a handle (7) is inserted through a hole. The handle with its end facing the brush is fixed to a container-head placed onto the opening for retaining the brush in the compartment filled with a hygienic mouth-refreshing agent. One brush is in the form of a inter-dental brush . The container forms a tooth-brush (10) handle whose end facing away from the tooth-brush head (12) is in the form of a container-top (9).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Behälter (1) zur Aufnahme eines fluiden, gelartigen oder pastösen Mediums in einem zum Eintauchen einer Bürste vorgesehenen Behälterraum (2) mit einer Entnahmeöffnung (3), in der ein zapfenartig in den Behälterraum (2) sich verjüngender Verschlußstopfen (4) sitzt mit einem Durchgang zum Einführen einer an einem Stil (7) sitzenden Bürste und Abstreifen der Bürste beim Herausziehen derselben aus dem Behälterraum, wobei der Stil (7) mit einem der Bürste gegenüberliegenden Ende an einem Behälterkopf (9) befestigt ist, der auf die Entnahmeöffnung (3) aufsetzbar ist für ein Aufbewahren der Bürste in dem Behälterraum, wobei der Behälterraum mit einem atemerfrischenden Medium zur Mundhygiene befüllt ist, in das eine Bürste in Form eines Interdentalbürstchens (6) zum Reinigen von Zahnzwischenräumen herausziehbar eingesetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 11/00; A46B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 11/00 (2006.01); A46B 11/04 (2006.01); A46B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 11/001 (2013.01); A46B 11/0006 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01); A46B 2200/108 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8026372 U1 19810212

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6220773 B1 20010424; AT 245918 T 20030815; DE 19903504 A1 20000831; DE 19903504 C2 20010308; EP 1023856 A2 20000802; EP 1023856 A3 20001129; EP 1023856 B1 20030730

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080121

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040102

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003052 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI