Global Patent Index - EP 1023857 A1

EP 1023857 A1 2000-08-02 - Frame for a device for displaying goods

Title (en)

Frame for a device for displaying goods

Title (de)

Gestell für eine Einrichtung zur Darbietung von Ware

Title (fr)

Chassis pour un dispositif de présentation de marchandises

Publication

EP 1023857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100292 A

Priority

DE 19902934 A

Abstract (en)

The table frame (20) is assembled from bars (2) joined together by corner pieces (15), each bar having a length direction groove (3) with its open side facing upwards, and each corner piece having two grooves (16) extending at an angle to each other, with their open sides facing upwards too. Once the frame has been assembled, all these grooves combine to form a single cavity (4) capable of receiving functional parts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gestell (1) für eine Einrichtung zum Darbieten von Ware, mit einem nach unten abgestützten Rahmen (20), der durch Rahmenteile (2) und durch Eckteile (15) gebildet ist, wobei die Eckteile (15) die Rahmenteile (2) in wechselnder Folge verbinden. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass jedes Rahmenteil (2) eine längs verlaufende, nach oben offene Nut (3) besitzt, dass jedes Eckteil (15) zwei winklig angeordnete, nach oben offene Nuten (16) aufweist und dass die Nuten (3, 16) in montiertem Zustand des Rahmens (20) eine gemeinsame Vertiefung (4) bilden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 13/02; A47B 47/00; A47F 3/14; F16B 12/48; F16B 12/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/08 (2006.01); A47F 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/142 (2013.01); A47B 13/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19902934 A1 20000727; EP 1023857 A1 20000802; EP 1023857 B1 20040630; ES 2222855 T3 20050216

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006913

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100121

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100120

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222855 T3

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006913 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI