Global Patent Index - EP 1023859 A2

EP 1023859 A2 2000-08-02 - Support plate for furniture element

Title (en)

Support plate for furniture element

Title (de)

Tragplatte für Möbelkörper

Title (fr)

Plaque de support pour élément de meuble

Publication

EP 1023859 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100971 A

Priority

  • DE 29900661 U
  • DE 29907134 U

Abstract (en)

The holder to support carrier boards (9) at carrier frames (6) in furniture carcasses (1) is a shaped component (13,14), inserted into a U-shaped edge recess (11,12) at the board (9), with a bonding profile to grip over the edge of the recess (11,12) at least at the upper side. It is held in a vertical holder of a member (7,8) of the carrier frame (6), and supported at it. The shaped component (13,14) has at least one hook section (20).

Abstract (de)

Eine Tragplatte für Möbelkörper, insbesondere für Küchenmöbelkörper, weist ein in dessen Innenraum als Ablagefläche (3) abstützbares Plattenteil (2) auf, das umfangsseitig von einer Randleiste eingefaßt ist. Diese bildet einen im wesentlichen parallel zur Außenseite (5) des Plattenteils (2) verlaufenden Umrandungsteil (6). Die erfindungsgemäße Randleiste (4) ist mit einem oberen Anschlußteil (7) versehen, der das Plattenteil (2) im Randbereich als über die Plattenoberseite (3) vorstehende Begrenzung übergreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 95/04; A47B 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/48 (2006.01); A47B 77/04 (2006.01); A47B 96/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/48 (2013.01); A47B 77/04 (2013.01); A47B 96/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9417324 U1 19941208 - KESSEBOEHMER DRAHT & METALL H [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023859 A2 20000802; EP 1023859 A3 20030402; EP 1023859 B1 20060621; AT 330509 T 20060715; DE 50013007 D1 20060803; DK 1023859 T3 20061016; ES 2265811 T3 20070301

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-21 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING KG; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN DE JURIDISCHE ENTITEIT; FORMER OWNER NAME: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING E.K.

- Effective date: 20160621

2016-09-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING KG, DE

- Document: AT 330509 T

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING E.K., 49152 BAD ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50013007

2016-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013007

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING E.K., DE

- Document: AT 330509 T

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-09-26 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120919

2012-09-26 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120919

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING E.K., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEINRICH J. KESSEBOEHMER KG, 49152 BAD ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50013007

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEINRICH J. KESSEBOEHMER KG, 49152 BAD ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50013007

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013007

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

- Effective date: 20120516

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070119

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060922

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEINRICH J. KESSEBOHMER K.G.

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2265811 T3

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061121

2006-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-10-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013007 P 20060803

2006-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 95/04 A, 7A 47B 13/08 B, 7A 47B 88/00 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI