Global Patent Index - EP 1023867 A2

EP 1023867 A2 2000-08-02 - Sweeping machine with collecting container

Title (en)

Sweeping machine with collecting container

Title (de)

Kehrmaschine mit Sammelbehälter

Title (fr)

Balayeuse comprenant un récipient collecteur

Publication

EP 1023867 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125067 A

Priority

DE 29901362 U

Abstract (en)

The sweeper has a collection container (1) with door (16) and a refuse sorter (10) with a leaf sieve (12). The door and sieve are connected via a coupling system (18), which transmits movement (B) of the container door to the sieve. The system has at least one unidirectional element, e.g. a pressure roller (22) rolling off a guide of the door. The coupling system and/or the sieve are locked in a working position by a locking element (23), independent of the position of the door.

Abstract (de)

Eine aufnehmende Kehrmaschine umfaßt einen Sammelbehälter (1) mit einer Behältertür (16), ein an den Sammelbehälter angeschlossenes Sauggebläse (9) und eine Schmutzabscheideeinrichtung (10) mit einem Laubsieb (12), das aus einer Betriebsstellung in eine Wartungsstellung bewegbar (A) ist. Dabei ist die Behältertür (16) mit dem Laubsieb (12) über ein Koppelsystem (18) verbunden, welches die Bewegung (B) der Behältertür (16) auf das Laubsieb (12) überträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/0827 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901362 U1 19990506; EP 1023867 A2 20000802; EP 1023867 A3 20020417

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI