Global Patent Index - EP 1023868 A2

EP 1023868 A2 2000-08-02 - Water softener for dishwasher

Title (en)

Water softener for dishwasher

Title (de)

Kleinenthärter für Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Adoucisseur d'eau pour machine à laver la vaisselle

Publication

EP 1023868 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124000 A

Priority

DE 19903635 A

Abstract (en)

A dishwasher has a water softener in which an exchange of ions takes place within containers forming part of a single unit. The water softener has a salt reservoir linked with a dosing unit holding a regenerative saline solution. During the washing cycle, container(s) operates the water softening process, while another container is regenerated by a reverse-flow of saline solution.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Enthärten von Frischwasser in einer Reinigungsvorrichtung für Geschirr- und/oder Tabletteile umfaßt einen geschlossenen Behälter, in dem sich mindestens ein Ionenaustauschbehälter (52; 52a, 52b, 52c, 52d), ein Salzbehälter (54) sowie eine Dosiereinrichtung (82, 84) für Salzlösung zum Regenerieren in Strömungsverbindung miteinander befinden. Das Verfahren umfaßt die Schritte des Spülens des mindestens einen regenerierten Austauschbehälters mit Wasser zwischen den Schritten des Waschens und des Spülens der Geschirr- und/oder Tabletteile, das Beladen des mindestens einen Austauschbehälters zum Enthärten von Spülflüssigkeit sowie das Regenerieren des mindestens einen Austauschbehälters mittels des Durchströmens mit Salzlösung. Der Austauschbehälter wird während des Enthärtens von Wasser und des Regenerierens in entgegengesetzter Strömungsrichtung durchströmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4229 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023868 A2 20000802; EP 1023868 A3 20010711; DE 19903635 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020112

2002-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI