Global Patent Index - EP 1023869 A3

EP 1023869 A3 2001-01-03 - Device for the drying of dishes and diswashing machine using said device

Title (en)

Device for the drying of dishes and diswashing machine using said device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Geschirr und Geschirrspüler mit dieser Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour sécher la vaisselle et lave-vaisselle comportant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1023869 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200295 A

Priority

IT TO990064 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1023869A2] A device for the drying of crockery is described, of the type apt to induce a condensation of steam being present within the wash tub (1) of a dishwasher by means of the cooling of at least one wall of said tub (1), characterized in that means (15-19) are provided for directing onto the inner surface of said wall a jet or spray of liquid apt to determine a cooling of said wall, so as to favour the condensation on said wall of at least a part of the steam being present within said tub (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/483 (2013.01); A47L 15/4229 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023869 A2 20000802; EP 1023869 A3 20010103; IT 1307124 B1 20011029; IT TO990064 A1 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI