Global Patent Index - EP 1023887 A3

EP 1023887 A3 2001-05-16 - Container for keeping and displaying medical pills, tablets or the like consisting of several interlockable units

Title (en)

Container for keeping and displaying medical pills, tablets or the like consisting of several interlockable units

Title (de)

Behältnis zur Aufbewahrung und Darbietung medizinischer Pillen, Tabletten od. dgl., bestehend aus mehreren zusammensetzbaren Einheiten

Title (fr)

Récipient pour garder et présenter des pilules médicales, tablettes ou similaire consistant en plusieurs éléments assemblables

Publication

EP 1023887 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100629 A

Priority

DE 29901544 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1023887A2] The container consists of a vertical stack of containers (1-7) for each day of the week with a round or polygon cross section. Inner dividing walls give each container segment compartments. The containers (1-7) have a central hole to take the vertical rod from the foot (9), to form a cylindrical or polygon block. A timer (10) is mounted to the top container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/00 (2006.01); A61J 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/0409 (2013.01); A61J 7/0084 (2013.01); A61J 1/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901544 U1 19990408; EP 1023887 A2 20000802; EP 1023887 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011110

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI