Global Patent Index - EP 1023940 A2

EP 1023940 A2 2000-08-02 - Device for decomposing scrapped apparatuses

Title (en)

Device for decomposing scrapped apparatuses

Title (de)

Zerlegungseinrichtung für Altgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de décomposition d'appareils au rebut

Publication

EP 1023940 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101149 A

Priority

DE 19903525 A

Abstract (en)

The treatment plant(1) has a disintegration chamber(3), the wall(2) of which has at least in sections protruding ribs, and a centrifugal breaking tool revolving in the chamber. The disintegration chamber is cylindrical in the main and is preferably positioned vertically. On its upper side the disintegration chamber has a filling opening(9), and a removal opening(26) located in the wall preferably in the breaking area of the breaking tool. The breaking tool is formed by at least two arms(18,19) extending away radially from a rotatably mounted hub(14) when in operation.

Abstract (de)

Zum Aufschluss von auf zubereitenden Gegenständen ist eine Aufbereitungseinrichtung (1) vorgesehen, die dazu eingerichtet ist, den vorhandenen Verbund zwischen unterschiedlichen Materialien des Gegenstands aufzulösen. Diese Aufbereitungseinrichtung weist einen Aufschlussraum (3) mit einem darin umlaufenden Schleuderwerkzeug (12) auf. Der Aufschlussraum (3) ist von einer Wandung (2) umschlossen, die wenigstens bereichsweise mit Vorsprüngen versehen ist. Dies können Rippen, Zacken, Noppen, Wellen, fingerartige Vorsprünge und dgl. sein. Durch Größenbemessung der Vorsprünge und Gestaltung der Form der Noppen kann sowohl die Zerkleinerung der Teile, die Trennung der stofflichen Bestandteile und die Formung der entstehenden Bruchstücke wunschgemäß beeinflusst werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/16 (2006.01); B02C 13/282 (2006.01); B02C 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/282 (2013.01); B02C 13/16 (2013.01); B02C 2013/2816 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023940 A2 20000802; EP 1023940 A3 20010502; DE 19903525 A1 20000803; JP 2000218185 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 02C 13/14 A, 7B 02C 13/16 B, 7B 02C 13/18 B, 7B 02C 13/282 B, 7B 02C 19/12 B, 7B 02C 13/04 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI