Global patent index - EP 1023941 A2

EP 1023941 A2 2000-08-02 - Beater mill

Title (en)

Beater mill

Title (de)

SchlagradmÜhle

Title (fr)

Broyeur à batteurs

Publication

EP 1023941 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101198 A

Priority

DE 19903154 A

Abstract (en)

With a change in operating conditions the number of beater plates(12) is adapted to the supply gas volume flow crucial for the drying in a way that while maintaining the dimensions of the beater wheel the number of plates is greater when the volume flow is increased and less when the flow volume is decreased. Alternatively, the profiling of the beater plates may change while the dimensions and number of beater plates remains unaltered.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schlagradmühle ist mit einem ein heißes Fördergas zur Mahltrocknung des Mahlgutes ansaugenden Schlagrad (6) versehen, das auswechselbare Schlagplatten (12) aufweist. Die Abmessungen des Schlagrades sind auf einen vorgegebenen Einsatzfall ausgelegt. Bei einer Änderung der Einsatzbedingungen ist die Anzahl der Schlagplatten (12) dem für die Mahltrocknung entscheidende Fördergasvolumenstrom in der Weise angepaßt, daß unter Beibehaltung der Abmessungen des Schlagrades (6) bei einem Anstieg des Volumenstromes die Anzahl der Schlagplatten (12) größer und bei einem Abfall des Volumenstromes kleiner als bei dem vorgegebenen Einsatzfall ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/288; B02C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/08 (2006.01); B02C 13/28 (2006.01); B02C 13/288 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/2804 (2013.01); B02C 13/08 (2013.01); B02C 13/288 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GR IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023941 A2 20000802; EP 1023941 A3 20010307; DE 19903154 A1 20000803; HR P990419 A2 20001031; TR 200000250 A2 20000821

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020111

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GR IE

2001-11-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: MK PAYMENT 20000122;RO PAYMENT 20000122;SI PAYMENT 20000122

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GR IE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20000122;RO PAYMENT 20000122;SI PAYMENT 20000122

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 02C 13/288 A, 7B 02C 13/08 B, 7B 02C 13/13 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GR IE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20000122;RO PAYMENT 20000122;SI PAYMENT 20000122