Global Patent Index - EP 1023942 A1

EP 1023942 A1 2000-08-02 - Shredding device with at least one rotary shaft

Title (en)

Shredding device with at least one rotary shaft

Title (de)

Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung mit wenigstens einer drehenden Welle

Title (fr)

Dispositif déchiqueteur ayant au moins un axe rotatif

Publication

EP 1023942 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101912 A

Priority

EP 99101912 A

Abstract (en)

The mill's rotor disc segments(2a) on the end of at least one of the U-members an outwards projecting extension(4) covering the upper face of the shaft(1) in the space up the next axially spaced rotor disc segment and extending from the U-member in the axial direction of the shaft. Both U-members have an extension and the upper face of the shaft is covered in its entirety. Each extension is hardened, and is recessed in an annular slot(3a) located in the shaft.

Abstract (de)

Die Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung weist wenigstens eine drehende Welle (1) auf, auf der im Abstand voneinander ringförmige Bunde (6) angeordnet sind, über welche Bunde (6) U-förmige Rotorscheibensegmente (2) gestülpt sind, die an ihrem Umfang Zerkleinerungswerkzeuge tragen. Ein Rotorscheibensegment (2) trägt am Ende wenigstens eines U-Schenkels wenigstens einen die Oberfläche der Welle (1) im Zwischenraum zum axial beabstandeten, nächsten Rotorscheibensegment (2) wenigstens teilweise abdeckenden, sich vom U-Schenkel in axialer Wellenrichtung erstreckenden, auskragenden Fortsatz (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/182 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023942 A1 20000802; EP 1023942 B1 20020327; AT 214970 T 20020415; AU 3043700 A 20000818; CN 1147362 C 20040428; CN 1323245 A 20011121; DE 59901057 D1 20020502; ES 2174550 T3 20021101; HK 1041843 A1 20040910; JP 2002535138 A 20021022; JP 4646407 B2 20110309; WO 0044499 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150130

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOGENSBERGER PATENT- AND MARKENBUERO DR. BURKH, LI

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150129

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150129

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150129

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140109

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SID SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DE LA DOUX S.A.

- Free text: SID SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DE LA DOUX S.A.#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE#2123 ST-SULPICE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SID SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DE LA DOUX S.A.#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE#2123 ST-SULPICE (CH)

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174550 T3

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901057 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214970 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SID SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DE LA DOUX S.A.

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR LI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI