Global patent index - EP 1023959 A2

EP 1023959 A2 2000-08-02 - Composite article prepared by powder metallurgy and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Composite article prepared by powder metallurgy and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Pulvermetallurgisch hergestellter Verbundwerkstoff und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Article composite préparé par métallurgie des poudres et sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1023959 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101609 A

Priority

DE 19903619 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19903619C1] A powder metallurgical composite material comprises refractory solid solution or intermetallic phase grains embedded in a low melting metal matrix. A powder metallurgically produced composite material comprises a metal matrix of \} 1200 deg C melting point containing embedded grains of refractory components in solid solution or intermetallic phase form. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above composite material, in which the refractory solid solution or intermetallic phase is produced by cooling a melt at greater than 100 K/min. Preferred Features: The matrix consists of Cu, Ag and/or Al and the refractory components are selected from group Vb (V, Nb, Ta) and VIb (Cr, Mo, W) metals and their nitrides, carbides, silicides and/or borides.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein pulvermetallurgisch hergestellter Verbundwerkstoff, umfassend eine Matrix aus einem Metall mit einem Schmelzpunkt von höchstens 1.200° C und einem in dieser Matrix eingebetteten körnigen Zusatz aus mindestens zwei Refraktärkomponenten, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Refraktärkomponenten in Form von Mischkristallen oder intermetallischen Phasen vorliegen. In einer Ausführungsform hat ein bzw. eine erste Gruppe an Refraktärkomponenten einen Schmelzpunkt von 1.500 bis 2.400°C und eine zweite bzw. eine zweite Gruppe an Refraktärkomponenten einen Schmelzpunkt von über 2.400° C. Die Herstellung des Verbundwerkstoffes erfolgt dadurch, daß man ein pulverförmiges Gemisch der Refraktärkomponenten durch Erhitzen in einen Mischkristall oder eine intermetallische Phase umwandelt und das daraus durch Abkühlen und Zerkleinern gewonnene Pulver auf pulvermetallurgischem Weg mit einer Metallmatrix mit einem Schmelzpunkt von höchstens 1.200° C verbindet. Der Verbundwerkstoff der Erfindung eignet sich als Schaltkontakt für Vakuumschaltkammern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 1/00; C22C 1/04; C22C 29/00; C22C 32/00; H01H 1/02; H01H 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 29/00 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/11 (2006.01); H01H 1/02 (2006.01); H01H 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 32/0047 (2013.01); C22C 1/0491 (2013.01); C22C 29/00 (2013.01); H01H 1/0203 (2013.01); H01H 11/048 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19903619 C1 20000608; DE 50014151 D1 20070426; EP 1023959 A2 20000802; EP 1023959 A3 20040324; EP 1023959 B1 20070314; ES 2283251 T3 20071101; JP 2000219923 A 20000808; US 6350294 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50014151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120301

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080129

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080129

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071217

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2283251

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-04-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2007-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2004-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 22F 1/00 A

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01H 11/04 B

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01H 1/02 B

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 22C 1/04 B

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 22C 29/00 B

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 22C 32/00 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI