Global Patent Index - EP 1023966 A2

EP 1023966 A2 2000-08-02 - Toggle lever clamping device

Title (en)

Toggle lever clamping device

Title (de)

Kniehebel-Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage à genouillère

Publication

EP 1023966 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123550 A

Priority

DE 29901364 U

Abstract (en)

The device has a working cylinder-type actuator unit (1) of multistage construction. It has at least two stages (13,13') positioned axially behind each other. Each stage has a fluid-charged actuator piston (14,14'), which is movement- connected to the actuator rod (6). The actuator stages have an associated control unit (15) for individual fluid charging of at least two pistons. The unit has esp. individually actuated control valves (35,35') for the pistons.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Kniehebel-Spannvorrichtung vorgeschlagen, die eine nach Art eines fluidbetätigten Arbeitszylinders ausgeführte Betätigungseinrichtung (1) aufweist. An der Betätigungseinrichtung (1) ist ein Lagerungskopf (2) vorgesehen, an dem ein Spannarm (3) verschwenkbar gelagert ist, der über einen Kniehebelmechanismus (12) mit einer Betätigungsstange (6) der Betätigungseinrichtung (1) in Wirkverbindung steht. Die Betätigungseinrichtung (1) ist mehrstufig aufgebaut und enthält wenigstens zwei axial hintereinandergeschaltete Betätigungseinheiten (13, 13'), die jeweils einen mit der Betätigungsstange (6) bewegungsgekoppelten fluidbeaufschlagbaren Betätigungskolben (14, 14') aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/061 (2013.01); B25B 5/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901364 U1 19990506; EP 1023966 A2 20000802; EP 1023966 A3 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021111

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 23Q 3/06 A, 7B 25B 5/06 B, 7B 25B 5/12 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI