Global patent index - EP 1023967 A2

EP 1023967 A2 2000-08-02 - Electric power tool with suction device

Title (en)

Electric power tool with suction device

Title (de)

Elektrowerkzeug mit Staubabsaugevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Outil électrique avec dispositif d'aspiration

Publication

EP 1023967 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123053 A

Priority

DE 29822389 U

Abstract (en)

The electrical tool generates dust during operation, with removal of the dust via a dust extractor (5) connected in parallel with the tool across the supply current source (1), the current circuit of the dust extractor containing one or more switches, for delayed switching of the dust extractor in response to the on-off switching of the tool current circuit (11).

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Elektrowerkzeug mit Staubabsaugevorrichtung die Arbeitsweise zu erleichtern, sind das Elektrowerkzeug und die Staubabsaugvorrichtung 5 parallel an der Stromquelle 1 angeschlossen, wobei im Stromkreis der Staubabsaugevorrichtung 5 eine oder mehrere abfallverzögerte vom Stromfluß im Stromkreis 11 des Elektrowerkzeuges ein- oder ausschaltbare Schaltvorrichtungen für Funktionen der Staubabsaugevorrichtung 5 vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2006.01); B23Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822389 U1 19990304; CN 1092096 C 20021009; CN 1261570 A 20000802; DE 59910828 D1 20041118; DK 1023967 T3 20050103; EP 1023967 A2 20000802; EP 1023967 A3 20030205; EP 1023967 B1 20041013

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-01-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK IT

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE DK IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030308

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 23Q 11/00 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 47L 9/20 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI