Global Patent Index - EP 1023978 A1

EP 1023978 A1 2000-08-02 - Bin for preparing mortar

Title (en)

Bin for preparing mortar

Title (de)

Silo zum Anmachen von Mörtel

Title (fr)

Silo pour préparer du mortier

Publication

EP 1023978 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00200269 A

Priority

NL 1011156 A

Abstract (en)

The appliance for preparing mortar consists of a storage compartment (7) for the dry mortar , a mixer compartment (24) with inlet (21) and outlet (13), liquid-feeders for water, and feeders for dry mortar into the mixer compartment. A mixer mixing the dry mortar and liquid in the mixer compartment consists of a rotary shaft (22) on which are paddles (23) and extending from the inlet to the outlet. The paddles are shaped so that when the mixer turns they exert force at right angles to the pivot axle on the materials in the mixer compartment.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Mischen von Trockenmörtel mit Wasser. Zur Verbesserung des Vermischens von Wasser und Mörtel findet der Materialtransport durch die Mischkammer (12) ausschließlich infolge der Materialzufuhr in die Mischkammer (12) aus der Dosierkammer (11) statt. Der Mischer ist vorzugsweise als drehbare Welle (22), die mit in einer Ebene lotrecht dazu liegenden Streifen (23) versehen ist, ausgeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/12; B28C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/12 (2006.01); B28C 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/022 (2013.01); B01F 7/00708 (2013.01); B01F 7/04 (2013.01); B01F 15/0201 (2013.01); B01F 15/0251 (2013.01); B28C 5/1292 (2013.01); B28C 5/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023978 A1 20000802; NL 1011156 C2 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI