Global Patent Index - EP 1023992 A2

EP 1023992 A2 2000-08-02 - Method for forming corrugated paper container and container made therefrom

Title (en)

Method for forming corrugated paper container and container made therefrom

Title (de)

Verfahren zum formen eines Behälters aus Wellpappe und daraus hergestellter Behälter

Title (fr)

Procédé de formage d'un récipient en carton ondulé et récipient ainsi produit

Publication

EP 1023992 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201024 A

Priority

  • EP 95923944 A
  • US 26216594 A
  • US 40734195 A

Abstract (en)

A method for forming a corrugated paperboard container and a container made therefrom having a first layer of flat paperboard (12) to which is attached a second layer of contoured paperboard (14), said contoured layer having a plurality of flutes, each said flute including a first flute tip and a second flute tip, the flute rise being substantially vertical at the midpoint between said flute tips and a perforated layer of paperboard (30) having a plurality of openings (31) therein coupled with said fluted layer along said plurality of said flute tips, said forming method comprising, placing the corrugated paperboard into a stamping die, the stamping die having a male die and a female cavity shaped in the shape in which the paperboard is to be formed; pressing the paperboard between the die and the cavity to apply a pressure to the paperboard; applying heat to the paperboard simultaneously with said application of pressure; and removing said die from the cavity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 43/00; B65D 81/26; B65D 65/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 43/00 (2006.01); B31F 1/00 (2006.01); B32B 3/28 (2006.01); B65D 65/40 (2006.01); B65D 81/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/264 (2013.01); B65D 65/403 (2013.01); B65D 81/262 (2013.01); B31B 2201/223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9535204 A1 19951228; AT 197932 T 20001215; AU 2864295 A 19960115; CA 2193386 A1 19951228; DE 69519573 D1 20010111; DE 69519573 T2 20010719; EP 0766622 A1 19970409; EP 0766622 B1 20001206; EP 1023992 A2 20000802; EP 1023992 A3 20010606; ES 2156208 T3 20010616; JP H10502585 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051228

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-03-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES LI

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE NEWARK GROUP, INC.

2000-08-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 766622

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES LI

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI