Global Patent Index - EP 1023994 A1

EP 1023994 A1 2000-08-02 - A heat mode sensitive imaging element for making positive working printing plates.

Title (en)

A heat mode sensitive imaging element for making positive working printing plates.

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Bildaufzeichnungsmaterial zur Herstellung von positiv arbeitenden Flachdruckformen

Title (fr)

Un élément pour l'enregistrement de l'image thermosensible pour la fabrication de plaques lithographiques positives

Publication

EP 1023994 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200288 A

Priority

EP 99200288 A

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided a heat mode imaging element for making a lithographic printing plate having on a lithographic base with a hydrophilic surface a first layer including a polymer, soluble in an aqueous alkaline solution and a top layer on the same side of the lithographic base as the first layer which top layer is IR-sensitive and unpenetrable or insoluble for an alkaline developer wherein said first layer and said top layer may be one and the same layer and said first layer and said top layer being the imaging layers; characterized in that said imaging layers have a glass transition temperature of at least 57 DEG C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41M 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/039 (2006.01); G03F 7/095 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41M 5/36 (2013.01); B41C 2210/02 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023994 A1 20000802; EP 1023994 B1 20040428; DE 69916773 D1 20040603; DE 69916773 T2 20050331; JP 2000221668 A 20000811

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170104

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916773 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI