Global Patent Index - EP 1023996 A2

EP 1023996 A2 2000-08-02 - Washing system externally of a printing machine for sleeve type rubber blankets

Title (en)

Washing system externally of a printing machine for sleeve type rubber blankets

Title (de)

Waschsystem ausserhalb einer Druckmaschine für hülsenförmige Gummitücher

Title (fr)

Système de lavage à l'extérieur d'une machine d'impression pour blanchets en caoutchouc en forme de boites

Publication

EP 1023996 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100173 A

Priority

US 23769599 A

Abstract (en)

The rubbercloth shell washing system is outside the printing press. It includes a shell washing device (20) with side frames, brushes and a washing solution application element, to clean rubbercloth shells (2) from the press. The rubbercloth shells cleaned in the shell washing device are taken out and laid in a storage rack (1), after which they can be put back into the press.

Abstract (de)

Ein außerhalb einer Druckmaschine angeordnetes Gummituchhülsen-Waschsystem umfaßt eine Hülsenwaschvorrichtung (20) zum Reinigen der aus einem Druckwerk (11) entnommenen Gummituchhülsen (2). Die in der Hülsenwaschvorrichtung (20) gereinigten Gummituchhülsen (2) werden in einem Lagergestell (1) aufgenommen und gelagert, um anschließend wieder in das Druckwerk (11) eingesetzt zu werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/06 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/001 (2013.01); B41P 2235/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 10000732 A1 20000727; DE 10000732 B4 20090520; DE 50004531 D1 20040108; EP 1023996 A2 20000802; EP 1023996 A3 20011107; EP 1023996 B1 20031126; JP 2000218770 A 20000808; JP 4638569 B2 20110223; US 6283028 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004531

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2004-12-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004531 P 20040108

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2003-11-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 35/06 A, 7B 41F 35/00 B, 7B 41F 13/00 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI