Global Patent Index - EP 1024069 A2

EP 1024069 A2 2000-08-02 - Emergency brake device for transport means

Title (en)

Emergency brake device for transport means

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Notbremsung von Transportmitteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de freinage d'urgence pour moyens de transport

Publication

EP 1024069 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890023 A

Priority

AT 11199 A

Abstract (en)

Each driveless friction wheel(2) is rotatably attached to the support(3), and a device(9,10,14) to transmit an adjustable torque is installed between the friction wheel and support. The friction wheel may be rigidly attached to the support. The support can be fixed in the neutral position by at least one lifting device(4) which may be a hydraulic cylinder. The support additionally interacts with an additional force loading mechanical element such as a spring(8) which acts in the direction of the braking position.

Abstract (de)

Gezeigt wird eine Einrichtung zur Notbremsung von Transportmitteln (1), insbesondere von Seilbahnen, mittels Reibrädern (2), die an zumindest einem mit dem Transportmittel (1) verbundenen Reibblech (6) angreifen, wobei mindestens ein Reibrad (2, 13) von einer Ruhestellung, bei der das Reibrad (2, 13) einen Normalabstand (b) vom Reibblech (6) aufweist, in eine Bremsstellung verbringbar ist, indem das Reibrad an zumindest einem beweglichen Träger (3) angebracht ist, welcher durch zumindest eine Hubeinrichtung (4) in Richtung zu bzw. von einem Reibblech (6) beweglich ist, wobei entweder das antriebslose Reibrad (2, 13) am Träger (3) drehbar befestigt und zwischen Reibrad (2, 13) und Träger (3) eine Vorrichtung zur Übertragung eines einstellbaren Drehmoments angeordnet ist oder das Reibrad (2, 13) starr mit dem Träger (3) verbunden ist. Dadurch wird eine verschleißarme Einrichtung zur Verfügung gestellt, die ein bedarfsgerechtes Verzögern, nämlich im Notfall, erlaubt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/06; B61B 12/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2006.01); B61B 12/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2013.01); B61B 12/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024069 A2 20000802; EP 1024069 A3 20010704; EP 1024069 B1 20030423; AT 238184 T 20030515; AT 409256 B 20020725; AT A11199 A 20011115; DE 50001822 D1 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170126

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 238184 T

- Effective date: 20170126

2017-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001822

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110501

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001822 P 20030528

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HIGH TECHNOLOGY INVESTMENTS B.V.

2000-11-24 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI