Global patent index - EP 1024087 A2

EP 1024087 A2 2000-08-02 - Device for producing and enveloping of melt-portions

Title (en)

Device for producing and enveloping of melt-portions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen und Umhüllen von Schmelzenportionen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fabriquer et envelopper des portions fondues

Publication

EP 1024087 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101234 A

Priority

DE 29901565 U

Abstract (en)

A system(15) for turning over the film edges(23) onto the melt portions(22) follows the cross-cutting unit(13) and an additional system(16) folds each melt portion(19) back onto itself at half the length or breadth to double the thickness. Each opening(20) in the grid(3) is divided into two halves by a strip(21) of a reduced height compared with the grid. At the feeding end of the equipment is a suction system(10) for drawing the underside of the wrapping film(9) into the grid openings. The grid has two or more adjacent rows of openings and a longitudinal cutter(14) divides the film strip(9) between each row.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Herstellen und Umhüllen von Schmelzenportionen, insbesondere Schmelzkleberportionen, mit einem umlaufenden Förderband (2), sowie mit einer wenigstens mit einem Obertrum des Förderbandes mitlaufenden Gittermatrix (3), die mit wenigstens einer in Förderrichtung verlaufenden Reihe von Aussparungen für die Aufnahme von Schmelzenportionen versehen ist, mit Mitteln zur Zuführung der Schmelzenportionen in fließfähigem Zustand in die Aussparungen und mit dem Förderband zugeordneten Kühlmitteln (11) zur Abkühlung der in der Gittermatrix befindlichen Schmelzenportionen, wobei der Gittermatrix eine Folienzuführeinrichtung zugeordnet ist, die eine mit der Gittermatrix mitgeführte Folie als Unterlage für die Schmelzenportionen bereitstellt, und wenigstens mit einer Querschneidvorrichtung (13), die jeweils eine Schmelzenportion begrenzende Folienzuschnitte unter Schaffung von freien Folienrändern aus der mitgeführten Folie bildet, ist bekannt. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, dass in Förderrichtung hinter der Querschneidvorrichtung Mittel zum Umschlagen der Folienränder der Folienzuschnitte auf die jeweilige Schmelzenportion angeordnet sind, und dass Mittel zum Zusammenklappen jeder Schmelzenportion etwa auf die Hälfte ihrer Längs- oder Quererstreckung und etwa auf das Doppelte ihrer Dicke vorgesehen sind. Einsatz für Einzelbandanlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 63/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/04 (2006.01); B65B 63/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/042 (2013.01); B65B 63/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19632787 A1 19980219 - SANTRADE LTD [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901565 U1 19990408; EP 1024087 A2 20000802; EP 1024087 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010630

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65B 63/08 A, 7B 65B 9/04 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI