Global Patent Index - EP 1024087 A3

EP 1024087 A3 2000-11-15 - Device for producing and enveloping of melt-portions

Title (en)

Device for producing and enveloping of melt-portions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen und Umhüllen von Schmelzenportionen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fabriquer et envelopper des portions fondues

Publication

EP 1024087 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101234 A

Priority

DE 29901565 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024087A2] A system(15) for turning over the film edges(23) onto the melt portions(22) follows the cross-cutting unit(13) and an additional system(16) folds each melt portion(19) back onto itself at half the length or breadth to double the thickness. Each opening(20) in the grid(3) is divided into two halves by a strip(21) of a reduced height compared with the grid. At the feeding end of the equipment is a suction system(10) for drawing the underside of the wrapping film(9) into the grid openings. The grid has two or more adjacent rows of openings and a longitudinal cutter(14) divides the film strip(9) between each row.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 63/08; B65B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/04 (2006.01); B65B 63/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/042 (2013.01); B65B 63/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901565 U1 19990408; EP 1024087 A2 20000802; EP 1024087 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010630

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 63/08 A, 7B 65B 9/04 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI