Global Patent Index - EP 1024090 A1

EP 1024090 A1 2000-08-02 - Container with spring opening closure

Title (en)

Container with spring opening closure

Title (de)

Box mit einem auf Druck öffnenden Innendeckel

Title (fr)

Conteneur avec fermeture ouvrable par ressort

Publication

EP 1024090 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100059 A

Priority

DE 19904301 A

Abstract (en)

The box comprises a container(2) open at the top, an outer lid(3) fitted on the container, and an inner lid(4) connected to the outer lid so that it is hinged independently of it and which reversibly closes an opening(32) formed in the outer lid. The inner lid has a forming(42) which fits in a correspondingly formed recess in the outer lid. By pressure on the outer lid on the recess the form-locking connection between the inner lid and outer lid is released. A metal spring element(5) bears upon the thus released inner lid.

Abstract (de)

Box 1, insbesondere für in Beutel verpackte Feuchtetücher, bestehend aus einem oben offenen Behälter 2, sowie einem Außendeckel 3, der auf den Behälter 2 aufgesetzt wird, einem Innendeckel 4, der derartig an dem Außendeckel 3 angelenkt ist, daß der Innendeckel 4 unabhängig vom Außendeckel 3 aufgeklappt werden kann, und der eine in dem Außendeckel 3 vorgesehene Öffnung 32 reversibel verschließt, wobei der Innendeckel 4 eine Ausformung 42 aufweist, die in eine entsprechend geformte Ausnehmung im Außendeckel 3 greift, durch Druck auf den Außendeckel 3 an der Ausnehmung die formschlüssige Verbindung zwischen Innendeckel 4 und Außendeckel 3 gelöst wird, zwischen Innendeckel 4 und Außendeckel 3 ein metallisches Federelement 5 vorhanden ist, das den derart freigegebenen Innendeckel 4 aufdrückt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/0871 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024090 A1 20000802; DE 19904301 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI