Global patent index - EP 1024099 A1

EP 1024099 A1 2000-08-02 - Device for opening and depositing a folded sheet on a travelling transport device

Title (en)

Device for opening and depositing a folded sheet on a travelling transport device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Oeffnen und Ablegen eines gefalzten Bogens auf eine laufende Transportvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour ouvrir et déposer une feuille pliée sur un dispositif de transport en mouvement

Publication

EP 1024099 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810065 A

Priority

EP 99810065 A

Abstract (en)

The device's two opening drums have acceleration rollers(29) to pre-accelerate the paper sheet in the horizontal direction, during which the sheet is held on the outer side between two sections rolling against each other. The opening drums each have at least two opening discs which release the sheets after opening, after which the sheets are accelerated in the transporting direction by the acceleration rollers before throwing them off onto the transporting unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung weist zwei Öffnungstrommeln (B, C) auf, deren Achsen (15, 16) im wesentlichen parallel zur Transportrichtung der Transportvorrichtung verlaufen und die jeweils einen Bogen an einem Überfalz öffnen und mit der geöffneten Seite voraus nach unten auf die Transportvorrichtung ablegen. Die Öffnungstrommeln (B, C) weisen Mittel (29) auf, mit denen die Bogen (12) jeweils auf den Öffnungstrommeln (B, C) horizontal in der Transportvorrichtung (13) vorbeschleunigt werden. Die Mittel (29) sind gemäss einer Ausführungsvariante Beschleunigungsrollen (29), die schräg auf den Wellen (15, 16) der beiden Öffnungstrommeln (B, C) gelagert sind. Die horizontale Beschleunigung durch die Beschleunigungsrollen (29) erfolgt unmittelbar auf das Öffnen duch die Öffnungsscheiben (23-26). Die Erfindung ermöglicht eine wesentliche Leistungssteigerung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/30; B65H 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 19/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/30 (2006.01); B65H 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/307 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4492 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4531 (2013.01); B65H 2404/54 (2013.01); B65H 2405/541 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024099 A1 20000802; EP 1024099 B1 20020605; DE 59901612 D1 20020711; JP 2000219342 A 20000808; JP 4713701 B2 20110629; US 6375179 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130126

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130126

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130126

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI