Global Patent Index - EP 1024102 A2

EP 1024102 A2 2000-08-02 - Bobbin holder support structure

Title (en)

Bobbin holder support structure

Title (de)

Spulenhalter

Title (fr)

Support de bobine

Publication

EP 1024102 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125429 A

Priority

JP 2174999 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a bobbin holder support structure that allows the natural frequency of a bobbin holder to be greatly varied in order to prevent resonance over a wide range of available rotations. The present invention enables a bobbin holder 5 to be rotatably supported at two root-side positions using support members 11, 12 so that the bobbin holder 5 can be supported like a cantilever, while enabling the tip side of the bobbin holder to be rotatably supported using a detachable support member, and provides an offset absorption member 14 in a support structure comprising one 12 of the root-side support members. Consequently, with the tip of the bobbin holder 5 supported, the bobbin holder 5 is arrested and supported substantially at the two positions in a radial direction using the other root-side support member 11 and the tip-side support member 13. Interposing vibration absorption members 23, 23 are provided for a support structure comprising the other root-side support member 11. Interposing vibration absorption members 24, 24 are provided for a support structure comprising the tip-side support member 13 (Fig. 2A). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/553

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/547 (2006.01); B65H 54/553 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/553 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2601/524 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024102 A2 20000802; EP 1024102 A3 20010131; EP 1024102 B1 20030903; DE 69910966 D1 20031009; DE 69910966 T2 20040722; JP 2000219430 A 20000808; JP 3682570 B2 20050810

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69910966

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69910966

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910966 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 54/553 A, 7B 65H 67/048 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI