Global Patent Index - EP 1024103 A1

EP 1024103 A1 2000-08-02 - Method for use of an elevator installation

Title (en)

Method for use of an elevator installation

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Nutzung einer Aufzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Méthode d'utilisation d'une installation d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1024103 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101129 A

Priority

  • EP 00101129 A
  • EP 99101917 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves a detection arrangement (5) automatically reading data (6) from an information source (1) carried by the lift user and a processing unit (9) connected to the detection unit providing a variable destination to the user after detecting the individual characteristics of the user. The lift user can select his own individual requirements regarding the type of destination default, whereby the selected type of destination default applies until the next selection.

Abstract (de)

Diese Einrichtung ermöglicht eine implizite oder explizite Eingabe von Zielrufen bei Aufzugsanlagen. Ein Informationsgeber (1) sendet nach einer entsprechenden Anfrage einer Erkennungsvorrichtung (5) Daten (6). Diese Daten (6) können direkte Informationen über das gewünschte Zielstockwerk enthalten und/oder dienen zur Identifikation des Aufzugsbenutzers und ermöglichen so einen Zugriff auf die in einem Speicher (8) abgelegten Informationen über das Zielstockwerk. Der Speicher (8) ist in einer Verarbeitungseinheit (9) einer Aufzugssteuerung (10) untergebracht. Die Kommunikation zwischen der Erkennungsvorrichtung (5) und dem Informationsgeber (1) erfolgt beispielsweise berührungslos. Anhand der erhaltenen Daten (6) wird in der Verarbeitungseinheit (9) das Zielstockwerk evaluiert und der Aufzugssteuerung (10) zugeführt. Die Zuteilung wird dem Fahrgast auf einer Anzeige (18) bekanntgegeben. Der Vorgang der Rufeingabe erfolgt selbsttätig und unabhängig von der Ausrichtung des Informationsgebers (1). Zur Änderung des von der Verarbeitungseinheit (9) vorgeschlagenen Stockwerkes ist eine Eingabeeinrichtung (19) vorgesehen, mittels der auch die Art der Fahrzielvorgabe wählbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/468 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4615 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4653 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0879782 A1 19981125 - INVENTIO AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024103 A1 20000802; EP 1024103 B1 20040901

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110121

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-09-20 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INVENTIO A.G.

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-07-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110721

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226618 T3

2005-03-04 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029780

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-12-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007573 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI