Global Patent Index - EP 1024186 A2

EP 1024186 A2 2000-08-02 - Telescoping tube for a discharging device of a coke oven charging car

Title (en)

Telescoping tube for a discharging device of a coke oven charging car

Title (de)

Teleskoprohr für eine Austragseinrichtung an einem Beschickungswagen für Koksöfen

Title (fr)

Tube télescopique pour un dispositif de déchargement d'un chariot de chargement d'un four à coke

Publication

EP 1024186 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122466 A

Priority

DE 19902968 A

Abstract (en)

The telescopic chute has a filler pipe (4) within an outer slidable pipe (5), and a sealing arrangement (10) between the two pipes. The sealing arrangement comprises an elastic deformable seal (11) and a compression unit (12) with a drive (13) which is preferably hydraulic. The telescopic chute has a filler pipe (4) within an outer slidable pipe (5), and a sealing arrangement (10) between the two pipes. The sealing arrangement comprises an elastic deformable seal (11) and a compression unit (12) with a drive (13) which is preferably hydraulic. During location on the charge-hole, the outer pipe is freely adjustable to accommodate height variations; operation of the hydraulic compression unit then squeezes the seal to close the annular gap between the pipe sections before the coal filling is started.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Teleskoprohr für eine Austragseinrichtung an einem Beschickungswagen für Koksöfen mit einem Füllrohr (4), einem das Füllrohr umschließenden, vertikal verstellbaren Außenrohr (5) und einer Dichtungsanordnung (10) zur Abdichtung des Ringspaltes zwischen dem Füllrohr (4) und dem Außenrohr (5) während der Beschickung eines Koksofens mit Kohle. Erfindungsgemäß weist die Dichtungsanordnung (10) eine das Füllrohr (4) umschließende elastisch verformbare Dichtung (11) sowie eine auf die Dichtung wirkende Spannvorrichtung (12) auf, die mit einem Antrieb (13) zum betriebsmäßigen Spannen und Lösen ausgerüstet ist. Die Dichtung (11) ist durch Spannen der Spannvorrichtung (12) gegen das Füllrohr (4) und gegen eine mit dem Außenrohr (5) verbundene Flanschfläche preßbar. Durch Lösen der Spannvorrichtung kommt sie von der Füllrohrwand wieder frei, so daß das Außenrohr (5) ohne Verschleiß der Dichtung (11) vertikal verstellt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 69/18 (2006.01); C10B 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 31/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024186 A2 20000802; EP 1024186 A3 20011024; EP 1024186 B1 20040128; AT 258584 T 20040215; DE 19964274 B4 20051117; DE 59908416 D1 20040304; ES 2214798 T3 20040916

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59908416

2015-11-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908416

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141112

2015-06-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2014-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59908416

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59908416

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908416

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908416

- Representative's name: RAINER ALBRECHT, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040628

2006-07-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-03-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214798 T3

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908416 P 20040304

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10B 31/04 A, 7B 65G 69/18 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI