Global Patent Index - EP 1024188 A1

EP 1024188 A1 2000-08-02 - Bleaching composition comprising substantially linear nonionic surfactants

Title (en)

Bleaching composition comprising substantially linear nonionic surfactants

Title (de)

Bleichmittelzusammensetzung enthaltend im wesentlichen lineare nichtionische Tenside

Title (fr)

Composition de blanchiment comportant des agents tensioactifs nonioniques sensiblement linéaires

Publication

EP 1024188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870013 A

Priority

EP 99870013 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a liquid bleaching composition comprising a bleach and a substantially linear nonionic surfactant, whereby said substantially linear nonionic surfactant has the general formula : R-(A)x-(B)y-(C)z-O-R1 wherein : R is an even numbered C6 to C22 alkyl chain or a mixture thereof, containing at least 90% linear alkyl chains; A is an ethoxy unit; B is a butoxy unit; C is a propoxy unit; x, y and z are independent integers of from 0 to 20; the sum of x+y+z is at least 1; and R1 is H, a C6 to C22 alkyl chain or a C6 to C28 alkyl benzene chain. Furthermore, the present invention relates to the use of said substantially linear nonionic surfactant in a fabric bleaching composition comprising a bleach to treat a fabric whereby stain removal and/or bleaching benefits are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/395; C11D 1/72; C11D 1/722; C11D 1/83; D06L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01); D06L 3/08 (2006.01); D06L 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/722 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 3/3956 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024188 A1 20000802; EP 1024188 B1 20050316; AR 022426 A1 20020904; AT 291076 T 20050415; AU 2968900 A 20000807; BR 0007717 A 20011113; CA 2358867 A1 20000727; CO 5210961 A1 20021030; DE 69924228 D1 20050421; DE 69924228 T2 20060330; ES 2239838 T3 20051001; JP 2002535447 A 20021022; PE 00232001 A1 20010215; TR 200102148 T2 20020121; WO 0043485 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-11-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20051216

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050616

2006-10-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Effective date: 20051216

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239838 T3

2005-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-06-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69924228 P 20050421

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/395 A

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/72 B

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/722 B

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06L 3/02 B

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/83 B

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI