Global patent index - EP 1024204 A2

EP 1024204 A2 2000-08-02 - Method of manufacturing a high Mn non-magnetic steel sheet for cryogenic temperature use

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a high Mn non-magnetic steel sheet for cryogenic temperature use

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines nicht-magnetischen, hoch mangan enthaltenden Stahlblechs für kryogene Verwendungen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un acier non-magnétique à haute teneur en manganèse pour applications cryogéniques

Publication

EP 1024204 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101428 A

Priority

JP 1791299 A

Abstract (en)

A method of manufacturing a high Mn non-magnetic steel sheet having low permeability at a cryogenic temperature suitable for use in large scale particle accelerators, the method comprises rolling a steel material containing, on the wt% basis, from 0.05 to 0.18% of C, from 26.0 to 30.0% of Mn, from 5.0 to 10.0% of Cr, 0.05 to 0.15% of N and, optionally, from 0.50 to 5.0% of Ni, in which a rolling start temperature is from 1050 to 1200 DEG C and a rolling end temperature is from 700 to 1000 DEG C. Further, a cold rolled sheet is annealed at an annealing temperature for cold rolled sheet of from 1050 to 1200 DEG C and cooled after annealing, the annealed sheet being preferably applied with temper rolling under control for the strength by varying a draft ratio. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/02; C22C 38/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01); C22C 38/58 (2013.01); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01); C21D 8/0236 (2013.01); C21D 8/0263 (2013.01); C21D 8/0273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024204 A2 20000802; EP 1024204 A3 20040128; JP 2000212646 A 20000802; JP 3864600 B2 20070110

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050307

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI