Global Patent Index - EP 1024214 A1

EP 1024214 A1 2000-08-02 - Device and system for positioning a weft yarn in a gripper loom

Title (en)

Device and system for positioning a weft yarn in a gripper loom

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Anordnung zum Vorlegen eines Schussfadens für eine Greiferwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et système pour positioner un fil de trame dans un métier à tisser à griffes

Publication

EP 1024214 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811211 A

Priority

  • EP 99811211 A
  • EP 99810074 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly to lay the weft yarns at a gripper loom has a linear motor with a stator (4) containing two permanent magnets (7), and an armature (5) with a coil (22). The weft yarn laying finger (2) is connected to the linear motor to present the weft at the gripper. The linear motor and the yarn laying finger (2) form a modular component group. The magnet holder (6) has a V-shaped cross section, with an opening (13) or holder to take the permanent magnets (7). The magnet holder (6) is of iron or a plastics material. The sliding units (9) for the armature (5) are in the holder (6). The linear motor has a core (21) of plastics, and two frame side sections (23) of a non-magnetic material to cover the coil (22). The sides are separated by a gap to reduce the eddy current effect. The linear motor can have a coil carrier with two legs, with a gap between the ends of the legs to reduce the eddy current effect. An Independent claim is included for a weft laying system at the gripper loom, with a number of units arranged in a fan shape at a holder structure, so that they can be exchanged separately. Preferred Features: The armature (5) of one linear motor is passed into the adjacent linear motor.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung enthält einen Linearmotor (1) mit einem Stator (4), der zwei Permanentmagnete (7) aufweist und mit einem Anker (5), der eine Wicklung (22) aufweist und ein Fadenvorlegefinger '(2) für den Schussfaden, das mit dem Linearmotors verbunden ist, um den Schussfaden einem Greifer vorzulegen. Der Linearmotor (1) und der Fadenvorlegefinger (2) ist als modulare Baugruppe ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024214 A1 20000802; EP 1024214 B1 20060517

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101224

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913432

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULTEX A.G.

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913432 P 20060622

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI