Global Patent Index - EP 1024221 A2

EP 1024221 A2 2000-08-02 - Ironing board

Title (en)

Ironing board

Title (de)

Bügeltisch

Title (fr)

Planche à repasser

Publication

EP 1024221 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118745 A

Priority

DE 19901677 A

Abstract (en)

At least two of the foot elements (10) located on one of the stand (11) sides are rotary feet. The rotary feet can be extended to bring the ironing surface (12) into an inclined position.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Bügeltisch (9) mit einer Bügelfläche (12) und einem Gestell (11), welches zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundene Scherenarmeinheiten aufweist, von denen jede im unteren Endbereich mit je einem Querarm (13) verbunden ist, wobei jeweils an den Enden der Querarme Fußelemente (10, 14) vorhanden sind. Zwei der Fußelemente (14), die an einer Seite des Gestells liegen, sind herkömliche Fußelemente und zwei andere Fußelemente (10), die an der gegenüberliegenden Seite des Gestells (11) liegen, sind als Drehfüße ausgebildet. Durch Herausdrehen sind diese Drehfüße verlängerbar, wodurch die auf dem Gestell angeordnete Bügelfläche (12) in eine zur Horizontalen in Richtung quer zur Längsausdehnung der Bügelfläche geneigte Lage gebracht wird. Der Vorteil der Erfindung liegt darin, daß dadurch das Bügeln bequemer wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901677 A1 20000720; EP 1024221 A2 20000802; EP 1024221 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06F 81/00 A, 7D 06F 81/04 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI