Global Patent Index - EP 1024221 A3

EP 1024221 A3 2000-12-20 - Ironing board

Title (en)

Ironing board

Title (de)

Bügeltisch

Title (fr)

Planche à repasser

Publication

EP 1024221 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118745 A

Priority

DE 19901677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024221A2] At least two of the foot elements (10) located on one of the stand (11) sides are rotary feet. The rotary feet can be extended to bring the ironing surface (12) into an inclined position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 81/00; D06F 81/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901677 A1 20000720; EP 1024221 A2 20000802; EP 1024221 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 06F 81/00 A, 7D 06F 81/04 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI