Global patent index - EP 1024222 A3

EP 1024222 A3 2000-09-13 - Process for the treatment of textile materials

Title (en)

Process for the treatment of textile materials

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ausrüstung von textilen Substraten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le traitement de matériaux textiles

Publication

EP 1024222 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101395 A

Priority

  • DE 19903080 A
  • DE 10000805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024222A2] The finishing process for textile substrates, using a matrix material in the voltage field of a low temp. plasma reactor, gives a pulsed voltage at the voltage field with a plasma within a sealed chamber. The frequency of the separate voltage pulses is in the ultrasonic range and the peak voltages are in the kilo electron volt (KeV) range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 10/02 (2006.01); D06M 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 10/025 (2013.01); D06M 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024222 A2 20000802; EP 1024222 A3 20000913

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030726

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI