Global patent index - EP 1024224 A2

EP 1024224 A2 2000-08-02 - Process and apparatus for making a fibrous web

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for making a fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bilden einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d' une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1024224 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125356 A

Priority

DE 19903943 A

Abstract (en)

The additive supply unit (21) has a controller varying the volumetric flow and pressure of the additive. Preferred features: The supply unit has a connection for admixture of e.g. compressed air or steam. It is located near the start or the central region of the dewatering zone. Following the supply unit there is a balanced pressure, reduced-intensity dewatering section, e.g. its plate is non-perforated. The supply unit extends over the band width, divided into several sections, each individually controlled to discharge a fraction of the additive. They have moving cleansing units. Spacing between successive dewatering sections (16A, 16B) is variable. In the double band zone, against one porous band, there is a porous plate dewatering section, opposed to strip formations on the opposite side of the double band. Strip widths and/or their spacing vary. Plate and/or strips are pressed flexibly against the double band.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Bilden einer Faserstoffbahn, insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, hat zwei kontinuierlich umlaufende endlose Siebbänder (S1,S2), die miteinander eine Doppelbandzone bilden zur Aufnahme einer Fasersuspension und zum Bilden der Faserstoffbahn durch Entfernen von Suspensionsflüssigkeit. In der Doppelbandzone sind Gleichdruck-Entwässerungselemente (15,16) vorgesehen, zwischen denen die Bänder mit der sich dazwischen sich bildenden Faserstoffbahn hindurchlaufen. Wenigstens ein Teil der Entwässerungselemente (15, 16) ist perforiert zwecks Abfuhr von Suspensionsflüssigkeit. An einem der Entwässerungselemente ist eine Zuführeinrichtung (21) für einen Zusatzstoff vorgesehen, z.B. für Fein-Faserstoff. Die Zuführeinrichtung (21) hat eine Steuer- oder Regeleinrichtung (24) zum Variieren des Volumenstromes des Zusatzstoffes, so daß die Zweiseitigkeit der Faserstoffbahn gesteuert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01); D21H 23/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024224 A2 20000802; EP 1024224 A3 20030716; EP 1024224 B1 20060802; AT 325232 T 20060615; AT 335101 T 20060815; AU 1249600 A 20000803; AU 3276400 A 20000818; DE 19903943 A1 20000803; DE 50012677 D1 20060608; DE 59913733 D1 20060914; EP 1075568 A1 20010214; EP 1075568 B1 20060503; NZ 502443 A 20000929; WO 0044980 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 335101

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-10-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59913733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070503

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HALMSCHLAGER, GUENTER, DR.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BACHLER, JOSEF

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MERCKENS, CHRISTOPH

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040116

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI