Global patent index - EP 1024226 A1

EP 1024226 A1 2000-08-02 - Artificial stone for pavings

Title (en)

Artificial stone for pavings

Title (de)

Kunststein für Pflasterzwecke

Title (fr)

Pierre artificielle pour revêtements

Publication

EP 1024226 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124800 A

Priority

EP 98124800 A

Abstract (en)

A paving slab (10) has vertical ridges on each side which interlock with similar profiles on the adjacent slabs. One profile comprises a single bar with a rounded tooth shaped profile which is gripped inside a double profile on an adjacent slab. The grooves and bars are shaped so as to leave a free space in the bottom of the groove to prevent trapped sand affecting the correct spacing of the slabs. The profiles can be provided with thin alignment ridges for an improved spacing accuracy.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Kunststein für Pflasterzwecke mit senkrecht zur Verlegeebene gerichteten Seitenflächen beschrieben. Die Seitenflächen weisen Abstandsnocken (1) auf, welche mit Abstandsnocken (1) von benachbarten Kunststeinen zusammenwirken, um zwischen im Verband verlegten benachbarten Kunststeinen eine Fuge vorzusehen. Die Abstandsnocken (1) sind in der Form von Zähnen (2) und hieran angepassten Zahnlücken (3) ausgebildet. Im aneinandergesetzten Zustand von zwei Kunststeinen greifen der Zahn (2) bzw. die Zähne des einen Steines in die Zahnlücke (3) bzw. Zahnlücken des anderen Steines ein. Die Zähne (2) und Zahnlücken (3) sind so ausgebildet, daß die Zähne (2) im aneinandergesetzten Zustand der Kunststeine den tiefsten Bereich der Zahnlücken (3) nicht vollständig ausfüllen. Auf diese Weise wird ein Pufferraum für Bettungsmaterial geschaffen, das beispielsweise bei Aneinandersetzen der Kunststeine zwischen die Abstandsnocken (1) gelangt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2013.01); E01C 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29702544 U1 19970417 - KANN BAUSTOFFWERKE GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024226 A1 20000802; EP 1024226 B1 20030319; AT 234966 T 20030415; DE 59807576 D1 20030424

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59807576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59807576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2004-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOMBILITH G.M.B.H. ENTWICKLUNG UND VERWERTUNG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMBILITH GMBH ENTWICKLUNG UND VERWERTUNG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE NL

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI