Global Patent Index - EP 1024228 A3

EP 1024228 A3 2001-12-05 - Apparatus for smoothing a concrete surface covering

Title (en)

Apparatus for smoothing a concrete surface covering

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Glätten einer Betonbelagoberfläche

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le lissage de la surface d'un revêtement en béton

Publication

EP 1024228 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101492 A

Priority

DE 19903638 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024228A2] A slip paver for concrete roads has a transverse boom for flattening the poured concrete and trailing panel system to finish the concrete. The whole system is carried on a wheeled frame with the transverse boom fitted with a drive which imparts a vibrating effect to the boom for working the surface of the concrete. The two boom sections (2,3) are linked by a central hinge (5) and a control to set the required apex profile. The paver is supported each side of the roadway on railed guides or on tracked supports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024228 A2 20000802; EP 1024228 A3 20011205; EP 1024228 B1 20030502; DE 19903638 A1 20000824; US 6386793 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20180201

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1024228E

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001925 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI