Global Patent Index - EP 1024230 A2

EP 1024230 A2 2000-08-02 - Device for activating the outlet valve of a flushing tank

Title (en)

Device for activating the outlet valve of a flushing tank

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Betätigung des Ventils eines Spülkastens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour activer le clapet d'un réservoir de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 1024230 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100315 A

Priority

  • DE 19903228 A
  • DE 19914841 A

Abstract (en)

A method for flushing a WC cistern has the release mechanism connected to the outlet valve (6) of the cistern via a brake (20). The brake provides a retarding action on the linkage and prevents the valve shutting suddenly at the end of the flush sequence. A simple system has a flexible connecting element looped over a brake pulley. The flush control can be a two stage system with a small volume and full volume flush.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur Betätigung eines Ventils (6) eines Spülkastens, dessen Wasserauslauf mittels des Ventils (6) absperrbar und durch Auslösen eines Spülvorganges freigebbar ist, enthält wenigstens ein Verbindungselement (18, 24) zur Betätigung des Ventils (6). Die Vorrichtung soll dahingehend weitergebildet werden, daß bei stufenloser Einstellbarkeit der Spülwassermengen für eine Zweimengenspülung das Schließgeräusch oder Gurgelgeräusche zumindest weitgehend vermieden werden. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß dem Verbindungselement (18, 24) oder dem Ventil (6) eine Bremseinheit (20) zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0503177 A1 19920916 - PLASSON MAAGAN MICHAEL IND LTD [IL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024230 A2 20000802; EP 1024230 A3 20020821; PL 338099 A1 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI