Global patent index - EP 1024241 A1

EP 1024241 A1 2000-08-02 - Lock fitting of the espagnolette or espagnolette-lock type

Title (en)

Lock fitting of the espagnolette or espagnolette-lock type

Title (de)

Verriegelungsbeschlag mit Treibstangen oder Treibstangenschloss

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage du type cremone ou cremone-serrure

Publication

EP 1024241 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440005 A

Priority

FR 9900917 A

Abstract (en)

Immobilisation mechanism of lock fitting includes divisible point (20) placed through aperture in handling rod (6) moving within opening (22) placed on edge plate (7). Immobilisation mechanism can ensure temporally immobilisation of handling rod relative to edge plate in two positions (A, B - B not represented). Different positions are selected through handling mechanism.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à une ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone ou crémone-serrure comprenant, logé dans un boîtier, un mécanisme de commande prévu apte à agir sur au moins une tringle de manoeuvre (6) s'étendant au-dessus et/ou en-dessous dudit boîtier, à l'arrière d'une têtière (7), cette ferrure de verrouillage étant pourvue, en outre, de moyens (19) d'immobilisation temporaire dans une position déterminée de la ou des tringles de manoeuvre (6) par rapport à ladite têtière (7). Selon l'invention, lesdits moyens d'immobilisation temporaire (19) sont définis aptes à assurer une immobilisation temporaire relative d'une tringle de manoeuvre (6) par rapport à une têtière (7) dans au moins deux positions (A, B) déterminées, sélectionnables, notamment au travers du mécanisme de commande. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/0012 (2013.01); E05C 9/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024241 A1 20000802; EP 1024241 B1 20041208; DE 60016475 D1 20050113; DE 60016475 T2 20051215; FR 2788806 A1 20000728; FR 2788806 B1 20010309

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60016475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060107

2006-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060107

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60016475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030819

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI