Global patent index - EP 1024255 A2

EP 1024255 A2 2000-08-02 - Support structure for an exhaust gas purification device

Title (en)

Support structure for an exhaust gas purification device

Title (de)

Trägerstruktur für eine Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Structure de support pour un dispositif d'épuration de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1024255 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100991 A

Priority

DE 19903591 A

Abstract (en)

The support structure includes a metal foil(1) in which are formed flow channels(2) which are in wave form in the flow direction. The support structure may be a multi-layered construction with at least two embossed metal foils, and the flow channels in the foil may be in sinusoidal wave form. The flow channels at the exit end(4) of the support structure are disposed at an angle( alpha ) to the main flow direction, and the exit angle of the flow channels of two adjacent metal foils may be orientated the same or oppositely.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Trägerstruktur (7) für eine Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung, insbesondere für Abgaskatalysatoren von Brennkraftmaschinen, mit zumindest einer Metallfolie (1), die eingeprägte Strömungskanäle (2) für das Abgas aufweist und bei welcher die Strömungskanäle der Metallfolie (1) in Durchströmungsrichtung (A) wellenförmig gebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2821 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2759559 C2 19850627

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024255 A2 20000802; EP 1024255 A3 20020717; DE 19903591 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI