Global Patent Index - EP 1024266 A2

EP 1024266 A2 2000-08-02 - Outboard motor

Title (en)

Outboard motor

Title (de)

Aussenbordmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur hors-bord

Publication

EP 1024266 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101528 A

Priority

  • JP 1764999 A
  • JP 2445499 A
  • JP 2445699 A
  • JP 2445599 A

Abstract (en)

An outboard motor with an engine mounted over an exhaust guide and with an oil sump, in which lubrication oil is collected, being disposed below the exhaust guide, said engine comprising cylinders in each of which a piston is slidably disposed, a cylinder block forming the cylinders; a crankcase covering the crankshaft side of the cylinder block to form a crank chamber; a cylinder head covering the combustion chamber side of the cylinders; an intake passage formed through the cylinder head to supply air to the combustion chambers, and an exhaust passage formed through the cylinder head to discharge exhaust gas from the combustion chambers. The intake and exhaust passages are disposed on either, right or left side of the engine, and that a crank chamber return oil passage making communication between the crank chamber and the oil sump is disposed on the same side as the intake and exhaust passages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 61/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/20 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/20 (2013.01); F02B 61/045 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1808 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024266 A2 20000802; EP 1024266 A3 20020220; EP 1024266 B1 20051026; DE 60023369 D1 20051201; DE 60023369 T2 20060420

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60023369

- Effective date: 20110802

2010-08-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023369 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA MARINE KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2002-11-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI